TN HB1116 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-22 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the punishment for reckless endangerment with a deadly weapon to a Class D felony if the offense occurred during a road rage incident. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, increases the punishment for reckless endangerment with a deadly weapon to a Class D felony if the offense occurred during a road rage incident. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2020-01-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 1/22/2020 |
2019-04-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0603 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee