TN SB0603 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the punishment for reckless endangerment with a deadly weapon to a Class D felony if the offense occurred during a road rage incident. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, increases the punishment for reckless endangerment with a deadly weapon to a Class D felony if the offense occurred during a road rage incident. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/14/2020 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2020 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1116 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.