TN HB1083 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the chartering authority to revoke or nonrenew a charter school's charter, if an employee fails to report child abuse; requires charter schools to provide information or training to employees on mandatory reporting of child abuse; allows parents of children attending a charter school to seek revocation or nonrenewal of the charter school under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, permits the chartering authority to revoke or nonrenew a charter school's charter, if an employee fails to report child abuse; requires charter schools to provide information or training to employees on mandatory reporting of child abuse; allows parents of children attending a charter school to seek revocation or nonrenewal of the charter school under certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1366 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-01 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1083&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1083.pdf |