TN HB1080 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, redefines "passive investment income" for family-owned noncorporate entities to include rents from commercial property for entities who qualified as an obligated member entity as of January 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-2008.
Title
As introduced, redefines "passive investment income" for family-owned noncorporate entities to include rents from commercial property for entities who qualified as an obligated member entity as of January 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-2008.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Rudd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Held on desk. |
2019-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/19 |
2019-03-25 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2019-03-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1198 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee