TN SB1198 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, redefines "passive investment income" for family-owned noncorporate entities to include rents from commercial property for entities who qualified as an obligated member entity as of January 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-2008.
Title
As introduced, redefines "passive investment income" for family-owned noncorporate entities to include rents from commercial property for entities who qualified as an obligated member entity as of January 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-2008.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1080 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-28 - Held on desk.