TN HB1078 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 382
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 382
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that, upon the seizure of any personal property subject to forfeiture and where the person in possession is not being arrested, the seizing officer must provide the person found in possession of the property, if known, a notice of the forfeiture warrant hearing; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 6 and Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, specifies that, upon the seizure of any personal property subject to forfeiture and where the person in possession is not being arrested, the seizing officer must provide the person found in possession of the property, if known, a notice of the forfeiture warrant hearing; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 6 and Title 40, Chapter 33, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-16 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 382 |
2013-04-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2013-04-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-04-03 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0891 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 382