TN HB1067 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 443
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates Reelfoot Lake as a Tennessee Heritage Site; authorizes commissioner to strategically market Reelfoot Lake for tourism development. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22 and Title 11.
Title
As enacted, designates Reelfoot Lake as a Tennessee Heritage Site; authorizes commissioner to strategically market Reelfoot Lake for tourism development. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 22 and Title 11.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 443 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/22/2019 | |
2019-05-22 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0535 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 443