TN HB1054 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Pub. Ch. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Pub. Ch. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, terminates families first advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, terminates families first advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Pub. Ch. 103 | |
2009-05-12 | Effective date(s) 04/27/09 | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-22 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-04-16 | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-16 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-04-16 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-04-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-04-13 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/13/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/09/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Government Operations | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1005 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 103
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1054&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1054.pdf |