TN SB1005 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 103
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, terminates families first advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, terminates families first advisory council. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 103 | |
2009-04-16 | Comp. HB subst. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/16/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1054 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Pub. Ch. 103