TN HB1051 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - action def. to 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - action def. to 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from November 1 to October 1, the date by which the BEP review committee must provide the annual report on the BEP to the governor, the state board of education, the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives, and the education committees of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes, from November 1 to October 1, the date by which the BEP review committee must provide the annual report on the BEP to the governor, the state board of education, the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives, and the education committees of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | action def. to 2020 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Ref. to Education |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0927 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee