TN SB0927 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes, from November 1 to October 1, the date by which the BEP review committee must provide the annual report on the BEP to the governor, the state board of education, the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives, and the education committees of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes, from November 1 to October 1, the date by which the BEP review committee must provide the annual report on the BEP to the governor, the state board of education, the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives, and the education committees of the senate and the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1051 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - action def. to 2020