TN HB1019 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes human resource agencies to obtain insurance in lieu of surety bonds to ensure the lawful performance by agency officials and employees of their fiduciary duties and responsibilities. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 19 and Title 13, Chapter 26, Part 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 19 and Title 13, Chapter 26, Part 1, relative to bond requirements for human resource agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 131 | |
2021-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0599 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2021