TN HB0996 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from February 15 to February 1, the date by which the state board of education, with the assistance of the department of education and the Tennessee higher education commission, must issue a report card or assessment on the effectiveness of teacher training programs. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 2, PNV 2 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0309) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-02-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2024-02-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0517) |
2024-02-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/12/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/8/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 1/31/2024 |
2023-03-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2023-03-14 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction |
2023-03-14 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1210 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Sponsor(s) Added.