TN HB0991 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to review the federal Prison Rape Elimination Act to examine how the state standards of detection and response to prison rape could be improved, and report its findings and recommendations to the governor and general assembly by January 15, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to sexual contact with an inmate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1471 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022