TN HB0987 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 267
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Pub. Ch. 267
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners may suspend, revoke, or refuse to issue or renew any license due to the person having a felony conviction if the felony conviction occurred within three years prior to the board’s decision or due to the person having a misdemeanor conviction involving moral turpitude if the misdemeanor conviction occurred within one year prior to the board’s decision. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, specifies that the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners may suspend, revoke, or refuse to issue or renew any license due to the person having a felony conviction if the felony conviction occurred within three years prior to the board’s decision or due to the person having a misdemeanor conviction involving moral turpitude if the misdemeanor conviction occurred within one year prior to the board’s decision. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Johnnie Turner [D] |
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. David Shepard [D] |
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Pub. Ch. 267 | |
2015-04-30 | Effective date(s) 04/24/2015 | |
2015-04-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0256) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0100) |
2015-03-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1306 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 267