TN HB0958 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds sales tax exemptions for certain agricultural equipment and technology purchased by qualified farmers and nurserymen that are used for conservation farming practices; modifies eligibility criteria based on row crop acreage for cost-share grants associated with the department of agriculture's Tennessee agricultural enhancement grant program for applicants who engage in conservation farming practices. - Amends TCA Title 43 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 43 and Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0955 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee