TN HB0954 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the state to assume responsibility to regulate effluents during any period in which the federal government is unable to exercise its responsibilities because of inadequate funds to operate the appropriate regulatory agencies. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
As introduced, requires the state to assume responsibility to regulate effluents during any period in which the federal government is unable to exercise its responsibilities because of inadequate funds to operate the appropriate regulatory agencies. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 69.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McCord [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-18 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0635 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. E,C&T Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0954&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0954.pdf |