TN HB0943 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, reinstates service credits and salary increases that were suspended during 2009-2010 for assistant public defenders and assistant district attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Title 8, Chapter 7, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, reinstates service credits and salary increases that were suspended during 2009-2010 for assistant public defenders and assistant district attorneys. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14, Part 1 and Title 8, Chapter 7, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 202 | |
2019-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action def. in Judiciary to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0799 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 202