TN HB0941 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-21)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, removes $180 fee for an individual petitioning the court for an expunction of certain criminal offenses; removes $350 fee for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, removes $180 fee for an individual petitioning the court for an expunction of certain criminal offenses; removes $350 fee for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 200
2019-04-10HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAction def. in Judiciary to 3/20/2019
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0797 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 200

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback