TN HB0919 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Pub. Ch. 1080
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Pub. Ch. 1080
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that the determination of whether a DUI offender is a multiple offender be made by counting the number of years that have elapsed between "the dates of the violations that resulted in the convictions" rather than the number of years that have elapsed between "the dates of the convictions"; applies to an offender if at least one DUI violation of the offender occurs on or after July 1, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10.
Title
As enacted, requires that the determination of whether a DUI offender is a multiple offender be made by counting the number of years that have elapsed between "the dates of the violations that resulted in the convictions" rather than the number of years that have elapsed between "the dates of the convictions"; applies to an offender if at least one DUI violation of the offender occurs on or after July 1, 2010. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Pub. Ch. 1080 | |
2010-06-28 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-08 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-06-04 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3 Ayes 93, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-03 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/04/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-03 | S. adopted am. 3 | |
2010-06-03 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-17 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-17 | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-16 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Reset on regular cal. for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0844 (Crossfiled) 2010-06-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1080