TN HB0918 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Def. to Summer Study in Safety & Funding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-12 - Def. to Summer Study in Safety & Funding Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20 days, the time period within which all fines, penalties, and forfeitures of bonds collected from violations of restrictions on the maximum gross weight of freight motor vehicles must be paid to the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 7, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, increases, from 15 to 20 days, the time period within which all fines, penalties, and forfeitures of bonds collected from violations of restrictions on the maximum gross weight of freight motor vehicles must be paid to the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 7, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1495 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
SB0676 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
SB0676 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee