TN HB0917 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the use of smoke alarms in one-family and two-family rental units, one-family and two-family dwellings, apartment buildings, and hotels. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 28; Title 68, Chapter 102 and Title 68, Chapter 120.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the use of smoke alarms in one-family and two-family rental units, one-family and two-family dwellings, apartment buildings, and hotels. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 28; Title 68, Chapter 102 and Title 68, Chapter 120.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 120 | |
2015-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1036 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 120
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0917&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0917.pdf |