TN HB0914 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-15 - Pub. Ch. 445
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons and provides for the placement of other certain signage. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Title
As enacted, provides for the naming of certain roads and bridges in honor of certain specified persons and provides for the placement of other certain signage. - Amends TCA Title 54.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 2 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Pub. Ch. 445 | |
2011-06-15 | Effective date(s) 06/10/11 | |
2011-06-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-31 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-21 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-21 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-05-20 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-05-20 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-05-20 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-20 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0501) | |
2011-05-20 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0409) | |
2011-05-18 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/16/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Transportation | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0672 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 445