TN HB0903 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 338
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 338
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the commercial fishing advisory committee; requires TWRA to request approval from the Convention for the International Trade of Endangered Species (CITES) to establish a length limit of at least 36 inches and an annual season length no shorter than November 15 to April 15; requires TWRA to develop a plan to study sustainability, population conditions, and juvinal survival rates on waters not currently open to commercial roe fishing. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 2.
Title
As enacted, creates the commercial fishing advisory committee; requires TWRA to request approval from the Convention for the International Trade of Endangered Species (CITES) to establish a length limit of at least 36 inches and an annual season length no shorter than November 15 to April 15; requires TWRA to develop a plan to study sustainability, population conditions, and juvinal survival rates on waters not currently open to commercial roe fishing. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-12 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSERVATION & ENVIRONMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSERVATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Conservation & Environment Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSERVATION & ENVIRONMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Government Operations Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CONSERVATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Conservation & Environment Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 338 | |
2011-05-18 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2011-05-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/11/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/11/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2011-04-27 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Conservation & Environment Committee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Conservation Subcommittee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Conservation | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to Conservation & Environment Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1140 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 338