TN HB0895 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, declares that human life begins with fertilization, cloning, or its functional equivalent, at which time all legal and constitutional attributes and privileges of personhood attach. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, declares that human life begins with fertilization, cloning, or its functional equivalent, at which time all legal and constitutional attributes and privileges of personhood attach. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17HouseSponsor change.
2017-03-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-21HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0754 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback