TN HB0891 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes certain entities providing addiction treatment services or residential housing services for those in recovery to receive opioid antagonists and to administer those opioid antagonists in certain situations if certain criteria is met. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 1, relative to the use of opioid antagonists for drug-related overdoses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0583 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee