TN HB0888 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes a clerk to charge a fee of less than $100 for expunction; expands the offenses for which expunction is permitted; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 8-21-401 and Title 40, relative to expunction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Pub. Ch. 539
2021-06-01 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-25 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-13HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-07HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-05-05HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 90, Nays 0 PNV 1 HB0888
2021-05-04HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar #2 for 5/4/21
2021-05-03SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 2
2021-05-03SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0330)
2021-05-03SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-29SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-28HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-28HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-28HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0194)
2021-04-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021
2021-04-20HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021
2021-03-31HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2021-03-31HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021
2021-03-24HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021
2021-03-17HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
2021-03-10HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021
2021-03-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2021
2021-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021
2021-02-22HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2021-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-09HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0675 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 539

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback