TN SB0675 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 539
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a clerk to charge a fee of less than $100 for expunction; expands the offenses for which expunction is permitted; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 8-21-401 and Title 40, relative to expunction.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 539 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/20/21 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0888 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021