TN HB0878 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner to annually report the amount of disaster relief refunds issued by the department. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner to annually report the amount of disaster relief refunds issued by the department. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 12; Title 54; Title 55 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2015-04-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to2016 |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0818 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-24 - Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0878&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0878.pdf |