TN HB0876 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee wine and grape board to issue its annual report on the wine industry and viticulture in this state, and on current and future activities of the board, electronically to the governor, the commissioner of finance and administration, the chair of the agriculture and natural resources committee of the house of representatives, and the chair of the energy, agriculture and natural resources committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, relative to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/6/2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0422 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-26 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee