TN HB0875 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Def. to Summer Study in Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Def. to Summer Study in Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 15 days to 20 days, the time from the date an agency contract is executed or the first insurance application is filed that an insurer has to file a notice of appointment for appointment of a producer under the Insurance Producer Licensing Act. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 56; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 56; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to insurance.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Insurance Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref. to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1351 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee