TN HB0873 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits a person who has no more than two convictions to petition on a one-time basis for expunction of both convictions, if each offense is otherwise eligible for expunction and if the offenses were two misdemeanors or one misdemeanor and one felony. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Title
As enacted, permits a person who has no more than two convictions to petition on a one-time basis for expunction of both convictions, if each offense is otherwise eligible for expunction and if the offenses were two misdemeanors or one misdemeanor and one felony. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Rick Staples [D] |
Rep. Karen Camper [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 298 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/05/2017 | |
2017-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 5 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0481) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0308) |
2017-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0800 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 298