TN SB0800 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, permits a person who has no more than two convictions to petition on a one-time basis for expunction of both convictions, if each offense is otherwise eligible for expunction and if the offenses were two misdemeanors or one misdemeanor and one felony. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Title
As enacted, permits a person who has no more than two convictions to petition on a one-time basis for expunction of both convictions, if each offense is otherwise eligible for expunction and if the offenses were two misdemeanors or one misdemeanor and one felony. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 298 | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 5, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0873 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 298