TN HB0872 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of education to review all current laws and policies related to exclusionary discipline practices in public schools for students in pre-kindergarten through kindergarten and to develop guidelines and standards for alternatives to exclusionary discipline practices based on the findings of the review; establishes other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 10; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of education to review all current laws and policies related to exclusionary discipline practices in public schools for students in pre-kindergarten through kindergarten and to develop guidelines and standards for alternatives to exclusionary discipline practices based on the findings of the review; establishes other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 10; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 204 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2017 | |
2017-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-17 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0347) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 4, PNV 0 |
2017-04-10 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0247) |
2017-04-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action def. in Education Administration & Planning to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1394 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 204