TN SB1394 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department of education to review all current laws and policies related to exclusionary discipline practices in public schools for students in pre-kindergarten through kindergarten and to develop guidelines and standards for alternatives to exclusionary discipline practices based on the findings of the review; establishes other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 10; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the department of education to review all current laws and policies related to exclusionary discipline practices in public schools for students in pre-kindergarten through kindergarten and to develop guidelines and standards for alternatives to exclusionary discipline practices based on the findings of the review; establishes other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 10; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 204
2017-04-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-13SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2017-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2017
2017-04-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017
2017-04-04SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0872 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 204

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback