TN HB0862 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to provide juveniles who are in the department's custody and housed in a juvenile detention facility approved, certified, or licensed by the department, including youth development centers, with 24-hour access, seven days a week, to psychological and behavioral health services. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 5, relative to the department of children's services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/27/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2024 |
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-02-02 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0616 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024