TN SB0616 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to provide juveniles who are in the department's custody and housed in a juvenile detention facility approved, certified, or licensed by the department, including youth development centers, with 24-hour access, seven days a week, to psychological and behavioral health services. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 5, relative to the department of children's services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
2024-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024
2023-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023
2023-03-03SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-28SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2023-02-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/28/2023
2023-02-02SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-30SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-26SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0862 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback