TN HB0855 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the requirement that the executive director of the district public defenders conference initiate conference calls between district public defenders. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 16.
Title
As introduced, removes the requirement that the executive director of the district public defenders conference initiate conference calls between district public defenders. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14 and Title 16.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2018 |
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-26 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1104 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee