TN HB0852 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enhances the punishment for a second or subsequent conviction of aggravated cruelty to animals or a first conviction of aggravated cruelty to animals involving five or more animals, from a Class E felony to a Class C felony with a mandatory minimum sentence of 180 days; requires that 100 percent of the minimum sentence be served. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 66.
Title
As introduced, enhances the punishment for a second or subsequent conviction of aggravated cruelty to animals or a first conviction of aggravated cruelty to animals involving five or more animals, from a Class E felony to a Class C felony with a mandatory minimum sentence of 180 days; requires that 100 percent of the minimum sentence be served. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 3; Title 39; Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 66.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2019-04-03 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1277 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee