TN HB0835 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands Wilder-Naifeh technical skills grants to students attending the fire service and codes enforcement academy; limits such grants to $500 per student annually. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As introduced, expands Wilder-Naifeh technical skills grants to students attending the fire service and codes enforcement academy; limits such grants to $500 per student annually. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Moore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | Withdrawn. | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Education Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-03-31 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/31/2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Action def. in s/c Higher Education of ED to 3/31/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to s/c Higher Education of ED | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1464 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-08 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0835&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0835.pdf |