TN HB0831 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, decriminalizes the possession of up to one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, decriminalizes the possession of up to one ounce of marijuana. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1116 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee