TN HB0822 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from four times annually to three times annually, the minimum number of times each joint economic and community development board must meet. - Amends TCA Section 6-58-114.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 6-58-114, relative to joint economic and community development boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0579 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee