TN HB0780 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a law enforcement officer operating a manned traffic enforcement camera to do so only in a clearly marked law enforcement vehicle with authorized flashing lights that is visible to approaching vehicles; requires traffic citation issued based upon evidence from a manned traffic enforcement camera to be issued immediately upon determining that an offense occurred. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, requires a law enforcement officer operating a manned traffic enforcement camera to do so only in a clearly marked law enforcement vehicle with authorized flashing lights that is visible to approaching vehicles; requires traffic citation issued based upon evidence from a manned traffic enforcement camera to be issued immediately upon determining that an offense occurred. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 55.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Failed in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0760 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee