TN HB0738 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 424
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the doula services advisory committee, attached to the department for administrative purposes, to advise the department by establishing core competencies and standards for the provision of doula services in this state, and recommend reimbursement rates and fee schedules for TennCare reimbursement for doula services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 71, relative to doulas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 424 | |
2023-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0394 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023