TN HB0727 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each public school to have at least one student-accessible water bottle filling station within the school. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to water bottle filling stations.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Potts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0463 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee