TN HB0695 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 402
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds to and clarifies law concerning teacher training. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds to and clarifies law concerning teacher training. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 5, Part 56.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 402
2017-05-03HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-03HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-05-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-27HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017
2017-04-25HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-19HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017
2017-04-19HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-04-19HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
2017-04-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017
2017-04-10HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/12/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-29HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-03-28HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2017-03-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-15HouseMeeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/21/17
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-03-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-15HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2017-02-15HouseSponsor change.
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
2017-02-13HouseP2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
2017-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-08HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0614 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 402

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback