TN HB0667 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy and Resilience Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 68, relative to the Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy and Resilience Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 138 | |
2021-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0795 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021