TN SB0795 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy and Resilience Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 5 and Title 68, relative to the Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy and Resilience Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-04-21 | Pub. Ch. 138 | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 5 |
2021-03-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0031) |
2021-03-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0073) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0667 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 138