TN HB0649 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires an LEA to provide employees the opportunity to serve in a working group that annually collects, compiles, and submits a report of written suggestions received from the LEA's employees on how to improve the LEA to the LEA's director of schools and local board of education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to local education agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Raper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/8/2023 |
2023-03-01 | House | Action def. in Education Administration to 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/1/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0557 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee