TN HB0649 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 244
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes certain law enforcement officers employed by the office of inspector general within the department of finance and administration to make arrests for offenses involving criminal fraud and abuse of the TennCare program and any other violations of state criminal law related to the operation of TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, authorizes certain law enforcement officers employed by the office of inspector general within the department of finance and administration to make arrests for offenses involving criminal fraud and abuse of the TennCare program and any other violations of state criminal law related to the operation of TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pub. Ch. 244 | |
2017-05-11 | Effective date(s) 05/02/2017 | |
2017-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0370) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0357) |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0188 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 244